POWER OF ONENESS MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to individuals Provides human resources Provides services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
- South Africa
Governance
- 11 November 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GOODWELL NTHANI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PASTOR GEOFFREY MAPIKI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr RICHMOND MUIMO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAITH MUIMO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAYREEN KUFA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHIKUNI KUFA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130 | £120 | £120 | £120 | £120 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 OCTOBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY SPREADING AND PROPAGATING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 WELWYN CLOSE
GRANTHAM
NG31 7JU
- Phone:
- 01476566391
- Email:
- powerofoneness@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window