Financial history THE SCRATCHING POST (RESCUE AND SHELTER APPEAL FOR CATS)

Charity Number: 1105653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £159.51k £391.19k £335.56k £207.31k £346.55k
Total expenditure £186.19k £290.14k £192.56k £222.01k £229.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A