Financial history CRESCENT UNDER FIVES

Charity number: 1104654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £90.12k £112.26k £135.42k £130.63k £134.18k
Total expenditure £96.17k £103.18k £116.94k £121.29k £137.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A