THE HERCULANEUM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to advance to education of the public concerning the World Heritage Site of Herculaneum, to promote research into Herculaneum including the continuing investigation of the Villa of the Papyri at Herculaneum and its papyri, and to promote the conservation of the artefacts and buildings at Herculaneum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Italy
- United States
Governance
- 29 June 2004: Standard registration
- 07 May 2015: Funds received from 1107134 THE FRIENDS OF HERCULANEUM SOCIETY
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR ROBERT LOUIS HERBERT FOWLER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tobias Reinhardt | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Kay Byers | Trustee | 19 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joy Littlewood | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Annalisa Marzano | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clare Carter | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR Holger Marc Essler | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR Gianluca Del Mastro | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Mary Starling | Trustee | 28 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL GUY WILSON FBA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.54k | £13.48k | £10.29k | £92.66k | £45.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.82k | £11.37k | £11.46k | £88.84k | £53.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 JUNE 2004 as amended on 23 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE WORLD HERITAGE SITE AT HERCULANEUM 3.2 TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO HERCULANEUM, INCLUDING THE CONTINUED INVESTIGATION OF THE VILLA OF THE PAPYRI AT HERCULANEUM AND ITS PAPYRI, AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH 3.3 TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, OF THE ARTEFACTS AND BUILDINGS AT HERCULANEUM.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
HERCULANEUM SOCIETY
IOANNOU CENTRE
66 ST GILES
OXFORD
OX1 3LU
- Phone:
- 01865 288260
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window