Trustees BYFIELD SCHOOL PTA
Charity number: 1104808

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Humphrey | Chair | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joy Parker | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharese Gascoigne | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte George | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Holly Riches | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Henderson | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bateman | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paula Warne | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosanne Lyddon | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Shepherd | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.