MAJOR MUSIC
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Music provides the soundtrack to people's lives. It can be educational, informative and empowering, but it should also be enjoyed. Creative music making and affording young people constructive, meaningful and rewarding opportunities has been a key theme to Major Music and it's aims and objectives since it's inception in February 2000.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 27 September 2004: Standard registration
- 26 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.10k | £32.04k | £20.53k | £11.89k | £23.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.58k | £28.79k | £17.13k | £10.01k | £14.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 16 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 17 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 03 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 24 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 24 January 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 22 FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 20 APRIL 2004 AND 21 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE, OTHER INDIVIDUALS, COMMUNITY GROUPS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN AND ACROSS THE VALE OF GLAMORGAN AND ITS NEIGHBOURING AREAS AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) ADVANCING PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOREGOING, THE ART OF MUSIC AND MUSIC MAKING (IN ALL ITS FORMS); AND (B) DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SUCH MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS; IMPROVE THEIR EMPLOYABILITY; AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
THE VALE OF GLAMORGAN AND ITS NEIGHBOURING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window