S.O.S FAMILIES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE POVERTY,ADVANCE EDUCATIONAND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION ,HEALTH AND OTHER LEISURE, OUTREACH SOCIAL WELFARE,MEDIATION AND WITH THE OBJECT IN IMPROVING LIVING CONDITIONS FOR ALL. TO ESTABLISH,OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE OR MEETING SPACE ;TO RESEARCH,IMPLEMENT ,CREATE,PROMOTE AND DEVELOP AWARENESS OF HEALTH,EDUCATION, TRAINING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 July 2004: Standard registration
- S.F.A. (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANMORE SITHOLE | Trustee | 17 October 2012 |
|
|||||
SEBOWA NAKITU | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
YVES KAZADI | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALOM MUMBALA | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPE DAVID | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.00k | £10.00k | £12.30k | £25.00k | £12.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.87k | £9.88k | £12.10k | £24.80k | £11.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 840 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 840 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1205 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1205 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1570 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1570 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, HEALTH AND OTHER LEISURE OCCUPATION, OUTREACH SOCIAL WELFARE, MEDIATION AND WITH THE OBJECT IN IMPROVING LIVING CONDITIONS FOR ALL. B. TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTER OR MEETING SPACE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTER")AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME "WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTIFS. C. TO RESEARCH, IMPLEMENT, CREATE, PROMOTE AND DEVELOP AWARENESS OF HEALTH, EDUCATION, TRAINING, WELFARE RIGHTS, AND SOCIAL CULTURAL ISSUES WITHIN AND AMONGST THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Bakers Hill
Clapton
London
E5 9HL
- Phone:
- 02035607750
- Email:
- sosfamilies@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window