LUDA'S CONVOYS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Luda's Convoys takes donations of goods to give a better life for sick or disabled, orphaned children in the Ukraine A 3000 mile journey that costs about -ú2,500 for a 20ft container Many items are not available in the shops, or second-hand; or are only available at great expense on the 'black market' Money is vital to meet ferry and fuel costs More details on www.ludasconvoys.org.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ukraine
Governance
- 16 July 2004: Standard registration
- 09 March 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.40k | £3.91k | £3.90k | £3.90k | £5.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.40k | £3.03k | £4.62k | £4.25k | £3.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 09 April 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 18 June 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 1ST SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE, THROUGH THE SUPPLY AND TRANSPORT OF HUMANITARIAN AID, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS FOR THE PEOPLE OF UKRAINE IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION.
Area of benefit
THE PEOPLE OF UKRAINE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window