Financial history COMMUNITY OUT OF SCHOOL IN ILFRACOMBE - EXTENDED SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1107045
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2006 06/04/2007 06/04/2008 01/04/2009 01/04/2010
Total gross income £13.03k £2.56k £756 £546 £0
Total expenditure £1.23k £540 £5.97k £859 £300
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A