Accounts and annual returns THE FRANK MCKENNA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1107665
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2007 16 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2006 07 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2006 Not Required