THE FRANK MCKENNA CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 January 2005: Standard registration
- 22 July 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2006 | 31/01/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.62k | £2.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £5.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2007 | 16 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2006 | 07 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 MAY 2004.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY: 1. THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSE, CURE AND TREATMENT OF CANCER; AND 2. THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO SUFFERS OF CANCER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window