RAFIKI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A charity to provide children with the opportunity to have a full and rich childhood; through education and the acquiring of skills for life; through fun and creativity and through the love of God - we support local people making a difference in their locality - with a particular focus on the developing world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- India
- Israel
- Kenya
- Tanzania
Governance
- 26 May 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS L E BANERJEE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
FIONA JANE WILKINSON | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Alan King | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAT LOVELESS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.13k | £1.98k | £1.97k | £1.98k | £1.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.65k | £4.45k | £1.10k | £1.35k | £2.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 9 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 9 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 29TH MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED ON 23RD MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND MATERIAL ASSISTANCE AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION. 3) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
136 The Grove
LONDON
W5 3SH
- Phone:
- 01202625296
- Email:
- rafiki_email@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window