Financial history IPSWICH AND SUFFOLK BANGLADESHI MUSLIM COMMUNITY CENTRE AND MOSQUE

Charity number: 1104877
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £113.34k £87.73k £135.05k £127.45k £151.32k
Total expenditure £77.91k £62.85k £71.75k £93.23k £97.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A