CLAPHAM PARK PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Clapham Park Project is a resident led community organisation which supports individuals in need in Lambeth.The organisation delivers projects supporting young people,the elderly and the unemployed.We undertake a range of community development activities which help residents to be active in their community,we also coordinate a Neighborhood Forum ensuring local people have a voice on local issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £108,357 from 2 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lambeth
Governance
- 24 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helene Williams | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tom Lowndes | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tomos John Rees | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Wedderburn | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alastair Morton | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy-Ann Allison | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Rymer | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANA MARY MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.67k | £234.33k | £152.67k | £156.34k | £195.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £294.30k | £287.58k | £317.05k | £349.53k | £451.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £33.46k | £87.13k | £75.00k | £42.00k | £108.36k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £88.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/06/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/03/2011
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE AREA OF CLAPHAM PARK) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP (B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE (D) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES (E) TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND TO ASSIST IN THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING (F) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES (G) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BYREASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES (H) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT (I) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE (J) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME (K) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY IN GENERAL AND IN REGENERATION PROJECTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR (1) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. 3.2 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT, ACTIVITIES AND EDUCATION WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
CLAPHAM PARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-4 BRIXTON HILL PLACE
LONDON
SW2 1HJ
- Phone:
- 02086785900
- Email:
- ajohnson@claphampark.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window