Governing document LOLLIPOP (YORK & DISTRICT)

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/03/2003 AS AMENDED ON 30/07/2003 AS AMENDED ON 30/07/2004 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 19 NOV 2016 as amended on 09 Apr 2019 as amended on 02 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
Support for children, young people and young adults with any level of deafness and their families by the provision of social and emotional support. To provide social activities with the object of supporting development of independence, confidence and wellbeing of deaf children, children of deaf adults, young people and young adults.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.