JUMP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
JUMP provides profession photography services for children with life limiting health conditions to enable them to capture special memories with families and friends. We run a programme of face to face and digital social events where the families we support can come together for activities, entertainment ,information and to access our photography and other range of support services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Gwynedd
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- St Helens
- Warrington
- Wigan
Governance
- 11 August 2004: Standard registration
- JUMP Childrens Charity (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Machin | Chair | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Christie | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christie Bower | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Bouch | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Chaderton | Trustee | 02 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Gaenor Morris | Trustee | 09 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE BENTHAM BCAv | Trustee | 20 February 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.15k | £70.45k | £41.89k | £61.71k | £91.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.22k | £50.62k | £43.45k | £74.82k | £60.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED 26 JULY 2004 as amended on 04 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
The Objects The Charity’s objects (the Objects) are: To provide unique visual and audio memories to support positive living and end of life care for children and young people under the age of 21 who have or are affected by life limiting health conditions. To provide Memory Making Events for eligible children and their families, offering activities, information and support. To provide online and telephone support where required to direct families to our support network and to provide support from the introduction of the charity’s services and throughout the journey of supporting a child with a life limiting illness, through to bereavement support for the family
Area of benefit
UNITARY AUTHORITY OF WARRINGTON BOROUGH COUNCIL
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Wiltshire Close
Woolston
WARRINGTON
WA1 4DA
- Phone:
- 0300 012 1302
- Email:
- enquiries@jump.uk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window