Financial history Alex, The Leukodystrophy Charity

Charity number: 1106008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £776.43k £731.98k £892.30k £949.23k £965.22k
Total expenditure £597.50k £707.11k £871.86k £981.81k £972.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £160.91k £147.24k £56.29k £2.59k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £214.34k £249.72k £185.72k £247.57k £215.00k
Income - Other trading activities £560.08k £482.24k £702.60k £697.73k £741.85k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £2.29k £4.64k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £134 £23 £57 £1.54k £3.63k
Income - Other £1.87k £0 £3.92k £100 £100
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £123.36k £191.94k £213.20k £319.63k £273.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds £474.14k £515.16k £658.66k £662.18k £698.96k
Expenditure - Governance £3.43k £3.10k £3.30k £10.91k £11.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0