Alex, The Leukodystrophy Charity

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A charity to promote awareness, research & prevention of leukodystrophy. Alex, The Leukodystrophy Charity enables sufferers of leukodystrophy worldwide a forum to come together to support and advise each other. We provide financial & emotional support as well as practical advice & updates on research innovations, promote and fund research & education for medical professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£965,218
Donations and legacies | £215.00k | |
Charitable activities | £4.64k | |
Other trading activities | £741.85k | |
Investments | £3.63k | |
Other | £100 |
Total expenditure:
£972,157
Raising funds | £698.96k | |
Charitable activities | £273.20k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £698.96k | |
Charitable expenditure | £273.20k |
People

27 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Akrotiri
- Albania
- Algeria
- American Samoa
- Andorra
- Angola
- Anguilla
- Antarctica
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Aruba
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Brunei
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Cayman Islands
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Christmas Island
- Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dhekelia
- Djibouti
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- Easter Island
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Falkland Islands
- Faroe Islands
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- French Guiana
- French Polynesia
- Gabon
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Greenland
- Grenada
- Guadeloupe
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guernsey
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jersey
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macau
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Malta
- Marshall Islands
- Martinique
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Caledonia
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Norfolk Island
- Northern Ireland
- Northern Mariana Islands
- North Korea
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Réunion
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Saint Barthélemy
- Saint Helena
- Saint Pierre And Miquelon
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- San Marino
- São Tomé And Principe
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Sint Maarten
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Svalbard And Jan Mayen
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tokelau
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- United States Virgin Islands
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Wallis And Futuna
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 23 September 2004: Standard registration
- 28 October 2024: Funds received from 1000614 THE BRITISH TRUST FOR THE MYELIN PROJECT
- ALD LIFE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Siriana Baldini | Chair | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Dalton | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Tan | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nick James Leopold Shiroi | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gil Sarig | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Tulsi Sandys-Winsch | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Elizabeth Amber | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Hadfield-Hudson | Trustee | 11 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Livingston | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iraj Idafar | Trustee | 06 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gavin Metcalf | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Bostock | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
LINDA CHRISTINE MILNE | Trustee | 16 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £776.43k | £731.98k | £892.30k | £949.23k | £965.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £597.50k | £707.11k | £871.86k | £981.81k | £972.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £160.91k | £147.24k | £56.29k | £2.59k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £214.34k | £249.72k | £185.72k | £247.57k | £215.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £560.08k | £482.24k | £702.60k | £697.73k | £741.85k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.29k | £4.64k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £134 | £23 | £57 | £1.54k | £3.63k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.87k | £0 | £3.92k | £100 | £100 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £123.36k | £191.94k | £213.20k | £319.63k | £273.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £474.14k | £515.16k | £658.66k | £662.18k | £698.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.43k | £3.10k | £3.30k | £10.91k | £11.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £24.36k | £18.25k | £43.40k | £34.82k | £32.72k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £308.59k | £363.22k | £355.52k | £337.63k | £397.25k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £52.22k | £75.87k | £72.88k | £79.00k | £143.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 20 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/08/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/07/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/11/2014 as amended on 13 May 2019 as amended on 06 Aug 2023 as amended on 28 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
1. The relief of sickness of people with leukodystrophy (also known as Inherited White Matter Disorders) and their parents and carers; 2 To promote medical research into leukodystrophy and the publication of useful results of such research for the benefit of the public; and 3 To advance the education of the public in leukodystrophy.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alex
The Leukodystrophy Charity
45 Peckham High Street
LONDON
- Phone:
- 02077014388
- Email:
- info@alextlc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window