Financial history BALVIMAA CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 1107095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £13.03k £21.17k £31.01k £29.15k £22.71k
Total expenditure £133 £1.14k £4.54k £14.87k £22.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A