THE TURNING POINT COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Based in Brighouse, we offer a counselling service to adults and young people in this area who contact us for help.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Calderdale
Governance
- 14 September 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Hoggard | Chair |
|
||||||
Ursula Blagg | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Hood | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL HARTLEY | Trustee | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID STANLEY PALETHORPE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.60k | £29.86k | £40.98k | £56.86k | £44.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.48k | £27.10k | £41.00k | £43.85k | £46.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/06/2002 AS AMENDED ON 23/08/2004 AS AMENDED ON 08/07/2013 AS AMENDED ON 20 JAN 2022
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND WELL-BEING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY OFFERING A COUNSELLING SERVICE BASED ON THE CHRISTIAN ETHOS TO ANYONE OVER THE AGE OF 14 YEARS, IN AN EFFORT TO RELIEVE EMOTIONAL AND MENTAL SUFFERING. THE PROVISION OF ONGOING DEVELOPMENT TRAINING TO QUALIFIED COUNSELLORS AND THOSE WORKING TOWARDS THEIR PROFESSIONAL QUALIFICATION TO HELP FURTHER THIS OBJECT AND THE ESTABLISHMENT OF OTHER SERVICES LINKED TO THE PRIME OBJECTIVES WHEN A RELEVANT NEED AND ADEQUATE RESOURCES ARE IDENTIFIED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Church Lane
BRIGHOUSE
HD6 1AT
- Phone:
- 01484950808
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window