ST EDMUNDS PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a pre-school for children aged between 2-5 years old. We are Ofsted registered for 60 children over 2 sessions as well as having some spaces available for all day care. Our hours of operation are between 9.00am-3.30pm. We follow the Early Years Foundation Stage Curriculum and provide a variety of activities to promote all areas of childrens development in a safe and stimulating environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £69,564 from 8 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Newham
Governance
- 15 July 2004: Standard registration
- 13 October 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- 13 October 2022: Funds transferred to 1103453 TRINITY COMMUNITY CENTRE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.95k | £111.31k | £117.32k | £111.27k | £78.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.40k | £103.58k | £112.72k | £120.49k | £92.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £87.42k | £100.48k | £103.58k | £99.84k | £69.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 22 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 22 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JUNE 1999
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE FOREST GATE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window