Accounts and annual returns LIBERTY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1105438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 April 2025 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 April 2025 432 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 July 2023 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 March 2022 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 March 2022 414 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required