Financial history CANONS REGULAR OF PREMONTRE, CANONRY OF PECKHAM

Charity number: 1104904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £104.28k £327.56k £114.85k £123.33k £528.03k
Total expenditure £110.28k £98.08k £98.06k £281.17k £421.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £124.72k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £88.46k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £59.14k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £255.72k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £421.03k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0