THE OLD ALBANIAN SPORTS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in particular the provision of facilities for members of the public to engage in team sports, athletics, fitness training and other forms of physical recreation. To advance the physical development of persons attending educational establishments in St. Albans and surrounding areas, with a view to improving their conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income:
£1,028,749
Donations and legacies | £55.32k | |
Charitable activities | £348.53k | |
Other trading activities | £562.61k | |
Investments | £208 | |
Other | £62.08k |
Total expenditure:
£1,231,011
Raising funds | £689.54k | |
Charitable activities | £541.47k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £689.54k | |
Charitable expenditure | £541.47k |
People

33 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 21 January 2005: Standard registration
- OLD ALBANIAN SPORTS ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Working name)
- OLD ALBANIAN SPORTS ASSOCIATION LIMITED - CONVERSION TO A CHARITABLE CO LIMITED BY GUARANTEE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Peter Newby | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Quinn | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Scott Bachmann | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Malcolm Richardson | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Goodier | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Hughes | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anna Marie Philpott | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES MICHAEL ANTHONY HODGE | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL EDWARD FISHER | Trustee | 06 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Alan Philpott | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|||||
ANDREW ROBERT PAGE MCCREE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £939.71k | £892.56k | £547.37k | £844.90k | £1.03m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.05m | £1.02m | £649.58k | £1.03m | £1.23m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £67.61k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £44.14k | £26.09k | £68.73k | £29.19k | £55.32k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £587.20k | £529.32k | £98.45k | £448.26k | £562.61k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £305.83k | £335.37k | £276.30k | £318.31k | £348.53k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £299 | £431 | £55 | £6 | £208 | |
|
Income - Other | £2.24k | £1.35k | £103.84k | £49.13k | £62.08k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £476.51k | £453.19k | £351.24k | £481.13k | £541.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £570.36k | £569.98k | £298.34k | £552.80k | £689.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £13.32k | £13.59k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.24m | £5.12m | £4.94m | £4.77m | £4.67m | |
|
Long-term investments | £2 | £0 | £2 | £2 | £2 | |
|
Other assets | £335.44k | £281.78k | £275.65k | £343.01k | £261.94k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £236.64k | £192.61k | £110.65k | £199.15k | £215.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 DECEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC TO ENGAGE IN TEAM SPORTS, ATHLETICS, FITNESS TRAINING AND OTHER FORMS OF PHYSICAL RECREATION; (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS ATTENDING SCHOOLS COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES IN ST ALBANS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THEIR PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT AND TO ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE PARTICIPATION BY SUCH PERSONS IN PHYSICAL RECREATION AND SPORT; (C) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO ORGANISE OR PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION FOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN ST ALBANS AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND (D) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE OF MANAGEMENT SHALL THINK FIT
Area of benefit
ST ALBANS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OA Sports
Old Albanian Sports Club
160 Harpenden Road
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL3 6BB
- Phone:
- 01727 864476
- Email:
- alanjphilpott@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window