HATIKVAH FILM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Christian faith
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 July 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Briggs | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Szkiler | Trustee | 17 June 2014 |
|
|||||
Meriel Dorothy Forshaw | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.81k | £30.96k | £47.33k | £32.70k | £37.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.16k | £33.62k | £43.15k | £29.99k | £38.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 November 2024 | 213 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 November 2024 | 213 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 May 2022 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 May 2022 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND THE UNDERSTANDING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND OF BIBLICAL PROPHECY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY THE PRODUCTION OF FILMS TELEVISION AND AUDIO-VISUAL PROGRAMMES; AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Halliwick Gardens
BOGNOR REGIS
West Sussex
PO22 7JE
- Phone:
- 03000111112
- Email:
- info@hatikvahfilms.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window