CRIDLING STUBBS COMMUNITY FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
environmental and community project funding
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 22 July 2004: Standard registration
- 25 February 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2007 | 29/02/2008 | 28/02/2009 | 28/02/2010 | 28/02/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.31k | £5.48k | £5.34k | £5.01k | £17 | |
|
Total expenditure | £789 | £314 | £4.88k | £15 | £545 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2012 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 FEBRUARY 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE VILLAGE OF CRIDLING STUBBS AND SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH PLANTING, HORTICULTURAL WORKS, RECREATION AND PLAY FACILITIES, WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE LIVING IN OR WORKING IN OR VISITING THE VILLAGE OF CRIDLING STUBBS AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
CRIDLING STUBBS AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window