FRIENDLY ASSOCIATION OF BURLEIGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 1104946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the charity is to advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by: 1) Developing effecitive relationships between the staff, parents and others. 2) Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £7,399
Total expenditure: £2,968

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 July 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FABS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Naomi Adlington Chair 11 October 2024
None on record
Ffion Roberts Trustee 11 October 2024
None on record
Kimberly Karman Trustee 24 September 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.64k £3.07k £0 £6 £7.40k
Total expenditure £8.13k £2.82k £350 £535 £2.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 April 2022 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 June 2021 341 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Oakdene
Cheshunt
WALTHAM CROSS
Hertfordshire
EN8 9JA
Phone:
07732196177
Website:

fabsburleigh.com