BANNERS GATE COUNSELLING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide an affordable & accessible counselling service to adults in the local community.(17 yrs of age & over). To provide the opportunity for trainee counsellors to have a placement whilst studying for their Diploma or Foundation Degree, giving them all the professional support they require. To encourage and support volunteers from the local community to help in administration support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 16 August 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Claire Lumley | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hoverd | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mennis | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JOHN HARBORNE | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROSALIND ANNE CLACKETT | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.75k | £21.96k | £30.70k | £28.44k | £31.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.24k | £26.44k | £26.57k | £36.97k | £32.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 FEB 2011 as amended on 28 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE SAFEGUARD AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AND WELL BEING OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CONFIDENTIAL COUNSELLING SERVICES TO PERSONS HAVING DIFFICULTIES IN THEIR PERSONAL LIVES WHETHER THROUGH BEREAVEMENT, MARITAL DIFFICULTIES, RETIREMENT, REDUNDANCIES, STRESS OR ANY OTHER SITUATION WHICH GIVE RISE TO ANXIETY AND DISTRESS. 3.2 TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN COUNSELLING CENTRES AND TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO ALL ISSUES RELATING TO COPING WITH PERSONAL AND FAMILY RESPONSIBILITIES WITH A VIEW TO PREVENTING POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS. 3.3 TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THOSE INVOLVED IN COUNSELLING AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PART THAT COUNSELLING CAN PLAY TO INCREASE THE PROVISIONS OF COUNSELLING SUPPORT TO THE BEREAVED AND TO THOSE WHO ARE MENTALLY, PHYSICALLY AND SOCIALLY DISABLED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE UPPER ROOM
ST MICHAELS HOUSE
198 BOLDMERE ROAD
SUTTON COLDFIELD
WEST MIDLANDS
B73 5UE
- Phone:
- 01213546544
- Email:
- INFO@BGCOUNSELLING.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window