Governing document THE ROYAL LEAMINGTON SPA ARCHERY SOCIETY
Charity number: 1107064

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/04/2003 AS AMENDED ON 20/04/2004 AS AMENDED ON 04/11/2004 AS AMENDED ON 26/04/2007 AS AMENDED ON 22/04/2010 AS AMENDED ON 12/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 13/11/2015
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE PURSUIT OF ARCHERY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCALLY IN THE LEAMINGTON SPA AREA OF WARWICKSHIRE.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.