THE TOWNSHIP TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the charity is to provide all and any kind of assistance such as the provision of money, material or other help to people living in the townships of South Africa and the territory of Southern Africa. The charity was closed and ceased to operate by 30 June 2009.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- South Africa
Governance
- 10 August 2004: Standard registration
- 04 June 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2005 | 30/06/2006 | 30/06/2007 | 30/06/2008 | 30/06/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.06k | £20.40k | £19.89k | £19.89k | £42 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.74k | £20.76k | £14.72k | £14.72k | £11.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | 31 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | 31 October 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 12 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | 12 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 27 February 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | 19 May 2008 | 19 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 06 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | 06 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | 08 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | 08 November 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN THE TERRITORY OF SOUTHERN AFRICA.
Area of benefit
IN THE TERRITORY OF SOUTHERN AFRICA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window