THE MARPLE BRIDGE AND MELLOR U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Subject study, social gatherings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Stockport
Governance
- 16 July 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Ann Turner | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
ULLA MEHTA | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Margaret Walker | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Colin Burkitt | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne Shirley Hammond | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clare Gwilym | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Norcross | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Dewhurst | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Holker | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.58k | £476 | £4.54k | £4.35k | £5.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.57k | £3.41k | £4.51k | £4.34k | £3.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JANUARY 2004 as amended on 19 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT, IN MARPLE BRIDGE AND MELLOR AND THE SURROUNDING LOCALITY. (II) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
MARPLE BRIDGE AND MELLOR AND THE SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Treetops Close
Marple
STOCKPORT
Cheshire
SK6 6GD
- Phone:
- 01614495151
- Email:
- treasurer@mbmu3a.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window