FRIENDS OF LADY ELIZABETH HASTINGS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1104950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Develops effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school and engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils. Largely engaged in fundraising activities for the school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £2,736
Total expenditure: £5,695

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 July 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRINDS OF LADY ELIZABETH HASTINGS SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Malene Scholtz Trustee 28 March 2024
None on record
Jennifer Dee Norman-Kerr Trustee 21 February 2023
None on record
Katie Elizabeth Riding Trustee 17 November 2020
None on record
Claire Victoria Swann Trustee 17 November 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.45k £6.15k £3.17k £2.48k £2.74k
Total expenditure £807 £3.35k £2.11k £5.19k £5.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 27 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 February 2025 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3-4 School Court
St. Marys Street
Boston Spa
WETHERBY
West Yorkshire
LS23 6BP
Phone:
07989559378
Website:

No information available