THE HEAVEN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arts and Media The Heaven Trust and the Heaven Channel represents Christians in media. The Heaven Trust is a charity that is dedicated to facilitate film, television and music production and distribution especially by and for other charities. Provide media and arts training and workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bolton
- Leeds City
- Manchester City
- Sheffield City
- Surrey
- Throughout London
- Belgium
- Cameroon
- France
- Gabon
- Ghana
- Guadeloupe
- India
- Ivory Coast
- Luxembourg
- Martinique
- Nigeria
- United States
Governance
- 15 February 2005: Standard registration
- 01 October 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- GODLYWOOD (Working name)
- THE GOD OF HEAVEN (Working name)
- THE HEAVEN CHANNEL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.10k | £32.47k | £32.47k | £71.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.90k | £22.74k | £32.40k | £67.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 25 March 2011 | 418 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 30 January 2012 | 729 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14 JANUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE CREATIVE AND EXPRESSIVE ARTS AND MEDIA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FILM, VIDEO, TELEVISION, MUSIC AND DRAMA BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY TELEVISION STATION AND STUDIO FACILITIES. 2. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY RAISING AWARENESS, UNDERSTANDING AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE FUNDAMENTAL BELIEFS OF CHRISTIANITY THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT, PRODUCTION AND DISTRIBUTION OF CHRISTIAN ARTS AND MEDIA PRODUCTS AND SERVICES. 3. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF SUBSIDISED FEES, GRANTS AND BURSARY'S TO ENABLE THEM TO UNDERTAKE TRAINING IN THE FIELDS OF ARTS AND MEDIA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window