Financial history PRESTBURY HALL USERS GROUP

Charity number: 1108431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.09k £23.69k £8.71k £19.10k £18.39k
Total expenditure £16.41k £13.14k £8.53k £15.95k £15.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.57k N/A N/A N/A