FLAG (SUPPORTING YOUNGSTERS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide quality recreational services and support for youngsters with special needs in the Grimsby, Cleethorpes, Immingham and surrounding areas: and to provide support and services to youngsters families by way of respite.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 19 July 2004: Standard registration
- FAMILY LINKS AROUND GRIMSBY (SUPPORTING YOUNGSTERS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS) (Working name)
- FLAG (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM GRAHAM RUDKIN | Chair |
|
||||||
Karen Elizebeth Smith | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAREN CHRISTINE VENNEY | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
LISA JANE COOMBER | Trustee | 04 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE WOOLLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID TOPLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS BRADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN AITKEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.98k | £50.10k | £17.08k | £8.74k | £5.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.25k | £28.58k | £12.77k | £2.51k | £37.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £33.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £38.88k | £8.51k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 352 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 FEBRUARY 2004
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF CARE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS RESIDENT IN GRIMSBY, CLEETHORPES AND DISTRICT AND BRINGING SUCH PERSONS INTO CLOSER ASSOCIATION WITH ABLE-BODIED PEOPLE, AND THE PROVISION OF, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH YOUNG PERSONS.
Area of benefit
IN GRIMSBY, CLEETHORPES AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 WHIMBREL WAY
NEW WALTHAM
GRIMSBY
DN36 4YX
- Phone:
- 07932507696
- Email:
- office@flaggrimsby.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window