SPIDER PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 14 January 2005: Standard registration
- 04 November 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SPIDER (SUPPORTED PROGRAMME FOR INDIVIDUAL DEVELOPMENT TO EMPOWER SELF-REALISATION) (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 01 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED ON 08 NOVEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE SPIDER PROJECT'S OBJECTS ARE AS FOLLOWS: (A) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES (AGED 13 AND OVER) IN ELLESMERE PORT, NESTON & CHESTER IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; AND (B) TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION THROUGH TRAINING SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES, THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
ELLESMERE PORT, NESTON & CHESTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window