Financial history THE ANDOVER CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1104982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £10.83k £6.96k £48.93k £10.84k £9.90k
Total expenditure £8.91k £3.80k £15.24k £18.39k £18.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A