Financial history FRIENDS OF WORLINGHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1105003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.90k £1.27k £2.53k £6.48k £5.79k
Total expenditure £3.95k £626 £1.94k £7.62k £6.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A