Accounts and annual returns BARNT GREEN HORSE AND ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 1105934
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2006 19 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not Required
Annual return 24 August 2005 15 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 August 2005 Not Required