DAVID HERZOG MINISTRIES TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of Religion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- France
Governance
- 23 July 2004: Standard registration
- 05 October 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | 30/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.92k | £582 | £1.56k | £1.65k | £1.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £955 | £426 | £368 | £437 | £5.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2012 | 01 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2012 | 10 April 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | 12 July 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | 22 June 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 20 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | 10 May 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 21 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | 27 November 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN FRANCE AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY
Area of benefit
FRANCE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window