Trustees HOME-START SOUTH WEST KENT
Charity Number: 1105047

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angus Robert Lockhart Bogle | Chair | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Cross | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Merrick | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Weare | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Tattersall | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dennis John Akehurst | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
WENDY MCGEACHY | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.