Accounts and annual returns NORTH DEVON ANIMAL AMBULANCE DIANA

Charity number: 1106314
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 11 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 11 March 2025 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2022 07 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 08 February 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 November 2020 On Time