Financial history AGORED CYMRU

Charity Number: 1105070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.76m £1.63m £1.68m £1.62m £2.18m
Total expenditure £1.42m £1.37m £1.45m £1.62m £1.70m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.18k £53.90k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.76m £1.52m £1.68m £1.62m £2.16m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £505 £498 £96 £1.73k £15.90k
Income - Other £0 £108.90k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.42m £1.37m £1.45m £1.62m £1.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.26k £54 £85 £138 £247
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0