Trustees AGORED CYMRU
Charity number: 1105070

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathleen Nancy Burns MBE | Chair | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Eakins | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne Reardon-James | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Colette Rees | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
CLARE KELL | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carl David Mather | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
HUW SWAYNE | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Moira Lewis Davies | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.