Accounts and annual returns THE ACADEMY SPONSORS TRUST

Charity number: 1105057
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 29 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 09 February 2006 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 09 February 2006 9 days late