Accounts and annual returns REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ("RCCG") GARDEN OF THE LORD

Charity number: 1105082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window