THE KIMMERIDGE TRUST

Charity number: 1106638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

In Kimmeridge, Dorset, we are in the process of establishing an accredited museum to conserve "The Etches Collection" of marine fossils, which is unique and of world importance. The new building will also provide Kimmeridge with a state of the art community cultural centre, for the benefit of the Kimmeridge residents in particular and the wider community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £434,409
Total expenditure: £366,027

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 November 2004: Standard registration
  • 08 April 2014: Funds received from 301143 KIMMERIDGE VILLAGE HALL
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • MUSEUM OF JURASSIC MARINE LIFE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tim Pennington Trustee 09 December 2022
None on record
Sir Richard Lambert Trustee 21 October 2022
None on record
Dr Stephen Earwicker Trustee 21 October 2022
None on record
Rosemary Clarke Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Nick Ford Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record
Peter Sheppard Trustee 13 August 2020
None on record
Dr Neil Langley Frewin Trustee 17 August 2017
None on record
Professor John Edward Alan Marshall Trustee 17 August 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £350.60k £327.80k £236.89k £255.38k £434.41k
Total expenditure £397.66k £348.58k £420.30k £440.66k £366.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Etches Collection
Museum of Jurassic Marine Life
Kimmeridge
WAREHAM
BH20 5PE
Phone:
01929270000