Trustees CHECKPOINT CHRISTIAN YOUTH TRUST
Charity number: 1105112

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER JOHN WIEBKIN | Chair | 20 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Jane Parsonage | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
MARK ROBERTS | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Sharon Roberts | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Bethany Sarah Helen Stark | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Mansell | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Tirzah Jones | Trustee | 05 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
LORNA RUTH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.