Kettleshulme School Parent Teacher and Friends Association

Charity Number: 1105103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

the object of the association is to advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by, developing effective relationships between the staff parents and others associated with the school and engaging in activites or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £5,030
Total expenditure: £4,487

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 July 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • KETTLESHULME SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
  • KETTLESHULME SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adam Richard John Turner Chair 11 March 2024
None on record
Helen Giles Trustee 11 March 2024
None on record
Lucy LONG Trustee 13 February 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £5.92k £2.36k £3.09k £7.03k £5.03k
Total expenditure £1.26k £6.02k £1.07k £9.21k £4.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 03 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 03 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 31 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Kettleshulme St James School PTFA
Macclesfield Road
Kettleshulme
HIGH PEAK
SK23 7QU
Phone:
01663732502
Website:

No information available