Governing document COLCHESTER ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 JUNE 2004 as amended on 20 Mar 2023 as amended on 26 Mar 2024 as amended on 11 Sept 2024 as amended on 01 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
The Charity’s Objects are:- (i) For the benefit and education of the public the conservation of the Earth's natural resources through projects and initiatives dealing with the preservation and protection of living animals and their habitats; (ii) To educate the public in a formal and informal manner through educational programmes raising awareness and respect for nature; (iii) To carry out scientific and quantitative research from which conservation and animal welfare benefits can accrue and to provide for the publication of the results of such research; (iv) To provide support whether financial or otherwise for projects operating nationally and internationally which focus on researching and conserving animal species in their natural habitats, in particular but not exclusively by working with UmPhafa Conservation Trust, an organisation (registered in South Africa with Public Benefit Number 93007572).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.